Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB663 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 663
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of the Tablerock Groundwater
 Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The Tablerock Groundwater Conservation District
 is finally dissolved on the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 8823, Special District Local Laws Code,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *