Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB669 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 669
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of online testing for high school
 equivalency examinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 7.111, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The board by rule shall provide for the administration
 of high school equivalency examinations through online testing.
 The rules must provide a procedure for verifying the identity of the
 person taking the examination.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *