Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB681 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 681
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 681 By: Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ability of electric utilities to provide electric
 service during a major power outage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 38, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.073.  AUTHORITY OF COMMISSION DURING AN EMERGENCY.
 (a)  On a declaration of a natural disaster or other emergency by
 the governor, the commission may require an electric utility,
 municipally owned utility, electric cooperative, qualifying
 facility, power generation company, exempt wholesale generator,
 power marketer, or retail electric provider to sell electricity to
 an electric utility, municipally owned utility, electric
 cooperative, or retail electric provider that is unable to supply
 power to meet customer demand due to the natural disaster or other
 emergency.  Any plant, property, equipment, or other items used to
 receive or deliver electricity under this subsection are used and
 useful in delivering service to the public, and the commission
 shall allow timely recovery for the costs of those items.  The
 commission may order an electric utility, municipally owned
 utility, or electric cooperative to provide interconnection
 service to another electric utility, municipally owned utility, or
 electric cooperative to facilitate a sale of electricity under this
 section.  If the commission does not order the sale of electricity
 during a declared emergency as described by this subsection, the
 commission shall promptly submit to the legislature a report
 describing the reasons why the commission did not make that order.
 (b)  If an entity receives electricity under Subsection (a),
 the receiving entity shall reimburse the supplying entity for the
 actual cost of providing the electricity.  The entity receiving the
 electricity is responsible for any transmission and distribution
 service charges specifically incurred in relation to providing the
 electricity.
 (c)  An entity that pays for electricity received under
 Subsection (b) and that is regulated by the commission may fully
 recover the cost of the electricity in a timely manner by:
 (1)  including the cost in the entity's fuel cost under
 Section 36.203; or
 (2)  notwithstanding Section 36.201, imposing a
 different surcharge.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than November 1, 2009, the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas shall conduct and complete a study to
 evaluate:
 (1) the locations in this state that are most likely to
 experience a natural disaster or other emergency;
 (2) the ability of each entity described by Subsection
 (a), Section 38.073, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, to comply
 with that section in the event of a natural disaster or other
 emergency; and
 (3) any steps an entity described by Subsection (a),
 Section 38.073, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, should take to
 prepare to comply with that section.
 (b) An entity described by Subsection (a), Section 38.073,
 Utilities Code, as added by this Act, shall comply with any order
 issued by the Public Utility Commission of Texas under that
 subsection while the study required by Subsection (a) of this
 section is conducted.
 (c) The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall prepare a
 report based on the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this
 section. The report must include any recommendations the
 commission considers advisable in relation to the implementation of
 and compliance with Section 38.073, Utilities Code, as added by
 this Act. The commission may include the report in the report
 required by Section 31.003, Utilities Code.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *