By: Ellis S.B. No. 696 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2009; February 23, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 29, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 29, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 696 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the use of certain state parking facilities, including the lease of the facilities, to other persons. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Section 2165.2035, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 2165.2035. LEASE OF SPACE IN STATE-OWNED PARKING LOTS AND GARAGES; USE AFTER HOURS. SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 2165.204 and 2165.2045 to read as follows: Sec. 2165.204. LEASE OF SPACE IN STATE-OWNED PARKING LOTS AND GARAGES; EXCESS INDIVIDUAL PARKING SPACES. (a) The commission may lease to a private individual an individual parking space in a state-owned parking lot or garage located in the city of Austin that the commission determines is not needed to accommodate the regular parking requirements of state employees who work near the lot or garage and visitors to nearby state government offices. (b) Money received from a lease under this section shall be deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund. (c) On or before December 1 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall submit a report to the legislature and the Legislative Budget Board describing the effectiveness of the program under this section. Sec. 2165.2045. LEASE OF SPACE IN STATE-OWNED PARKING LOTS AND GARAGES; EXCESS BLOCKS OF PARKING SPACE. (a) The commission may lease to an institution of higher education or a local government all or a significant block of a state-owned parking lot or garage located in the city of Austin that the commission determines is not needed to accommodate the regular parking requirements of state employees who work near the lot or garage and visitors to nearby state government offices. (b) Money received from a lease under this section shall be deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund. (c) On or before December 1 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall submit a report to the legislature and the Legislative Budget Board describing the effectiveness of the program under this section. SECTION 3. (a) In this section, "commission" means the Texas Facilities Commission. (b) The commission shall conduct a study on the actual usage of state parking facilities by state employees. In conducting the study, the commission shall: (1) for each state parking facility under the commission's charge and control, consider the: (A) available parking capacity of the facility; (B) number of state employees using the facility; (C) number of visitors using the facility; (D) amount and nature of revenue realized from the facility; and (E) excess capacity available within the facility; and (2) develop recommendations for the redevelopment of significantly underused parking facilities to purposes more suited to the efficient administration of state government. (c) Not later than September 1, 2010, the commission shall report the results of the study conducted under this section to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board. (d) This section expires January 1, 2011. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *