By: Ellis S.B. No. 698 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2009; February 23, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; March 25, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 25, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of a registry at the Texas Department of Insurance of certain legal entities determined to have sold race-based insurance coverage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 521, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Subchapter D to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER D. RACE-BASED INSURANCE REGISTRY Sec. 521.151. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter applies to any legal entity engaged in the business of insurance in this state, including: (1) a capital stock insurance company; (2) a mutual insurance company; (3) a title insurance company; (4) a fraternal benefit society; (5) a local mutual aid association; (6) a statewide mutual assessment company; (7) a county mutual insurance company; (8) a Lloyd's plan; (9) a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange; (10) a stipulated premium company; (11) a group hospital service corporation; (12) a farm mutual insurance company; (13) a risk retention group; (14) an eligible surplus lines insurer; and (15) an agent, broker, adjuster, or life and health insurance counselor. Sec. 521.152. REGISTRY. The commissioner shall establish a registry of legal entities engaged in the business of insurance in this state that have a documented history of: (1) refusing to insure or provide coverage to an individual, refusing to continue to insure or provide coverage to an individual, limiting the amount, extent, or kind of coverage available for an individual, or charging an individual a rate that is different from the rate charged to other individuals for the same coverage, because of the race or color of the individual; or (2) marketing a kind of insurance or insurance product to individuals predominately of the same race or color because of their race or color. Sec. 521.153. SUBMISSION OF INFORMATION TO DEPARTMENT. (a) The commissioner may require a legal entity subject to this subchapter to submit information to the department regarding practices of the entity that reasonably indicate a history of the activities described by Section 521.152. (b) The commissioner shall prescribe by rule the manner of submitting information under Subsection (a). Sec. 521.154. PUBLIC INFORMATION. (a) Information submitted to the department under Section 521.153 is public information. (b) The department shall prepare information of public interest describing the registry established under this subchapter. SECTION 2. The commissioner of insurance shall establish the registry and adopt rules as required by Subchapter D, Chapter 521, Insurance Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *