Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB725 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 725
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 3; April 30, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 725 By: Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review of certain river authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. SUNSET ACT. Chapter 325, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 325.025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 325.025.  CERTAIN RIVER AUTHORITIES AND OTHER WATER
 AUTHORITIES SUBJECT TO REVIEW AND ABOLISHMENT.  (a)  A river
 authority or water authority listed in Subsection (b) is subject to
 review and abolishment under this chapter as if it were a state
 agency.
 (b) This section applies only to the:
 (1) Brazos River Authority;
 (2) Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority;
 (3) Lower Colorado River Authority;
 (4) Lower Neches Valley Authority;
 (5) San Jacinto River Authority; and
 (6) Trinity River Authority of Texas.
 (c)  A river authority or water authority shall pay the cost
 incurred by the commission in performing a review of the authority
 under this section. The commission shall determine the cost, and
 the authority shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of a
 statement from the commission detailing the cost.
 SECTION 2. BRAZOS RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 8502, Special
 District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8502.0021 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 8502.0021.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The authority
 is subject to Section 325.025, Government Code.  Unless the
 authority is continued in existence as provided by Chapter 325 of
 that code, on September 1, 2013:
 (1) the authority is abolished;
 (2)  the assets of the authority are transferred to
 this state; and
 (3) this chapter expires.
 SECTION 3. GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 75,
 Acts of the 43rd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1933, is amended
 by adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  The District is subject to Section 325.025,
 Government Code.  Unless the District is continued in existence as
 provided by Chapter 325 of that code, on September 1, 2013:
 (1) the District is abolished;
 (2)  the assets of the District are transferred to this
 state; and
 (3) this Act expires.
 SECTION 4. LOWER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 8503,
 Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section
 8503.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 8503.0021.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The authority
 is subject to Section 325.025, Government Code.  Unless the
 authority is continued in existence as provided by Chapter 325 of
 that code, on September 1, 2011:
 (1) the authority is abolished;
 (2)  the assets of the authority are transferred to
 this state; and
 (3) this chapter expires.
 SECTION 5. LOWER NECHES VALLEY AUTHORITY. Chapter 63, Acts
 of the 43rd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1933, is amended by
 adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  The district is subject to Section 325.025,
 Government Code.  Unless the district is continued in existence as
 provided by Chapter 325 of that code, on September 1, 2015:
 (1) the district is abolished;
 (2)  the assets of the district are transferred to this
 state; and
 (3) this Act expires.
 SECTION 6. SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 426, Acts
 of the 45th Legislature, Regular Session, 1937, is amended by
 adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  The Authority is subject to Section 325.025,
 Government Code.  Unless the Authority is continued in existence as
 provided by Chapter 325 of that code, on September 1, 2015:
 (1) the Authority is abolished;
 (2)  the assets of the Authority are transferred to
 this state; and
 (3) this Act expires.
 SECTION 7. TRINITY RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS. Chapter 518,
 Acts of the 54th Legislature, Regular Session, 1955, is amended by
 adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  The Authority is subject to Section 325.025,
 Government Code.  Unless the Authority is continued in existence as
 provided by Chapter 325 of that code, on September 1, 2011:
 (1) the Authority is abolished;
 (2)  the assets of the Authority are transferred to
 this state; and
 (3) this Act expires.
 SECTION 8. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *