Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB725 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 725


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review of certain river authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. SUNSET ACT. Chapter 325, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 325.025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 325.025.  CERTAIN RIVER AUTHORITIES AND OTHER WATER
 AUTHORITIES SUBJECT TO REVIEW AND ABOLISHMENT. (a)  A river
 authority or water authority listed in Subsection (b) is subject to
 review under this chapter as if it were a state agency.
 (b) This section applies only to the:
 (1) Brazos River Authority;
 (2) Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority; and
 (3) Lower Colorado River Authority.
 (c)  A river authority or water authority shall pay the cost
 incurred by the commission in performing a review of the authority
 under this section. The commission shall determine the cost, and
 the authority shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of a
 statement from the commission detailing the cost.
 SECTION 2. BRAZOS RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 8502, Special
 District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8502.0021 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 8502.0021.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The authority
 is subject to review for the purposes of Chapter 325, Government
 Code, but may not be abolished under that chapter. The review shall
 be conducted as if the authority were scheduled to be abolished
 September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3. GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 75,
 Acts of the 43rd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1933, is amended
 by adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  The District is subject to review for the purposes
 of Chapter 325, Government Code, but may not be abolished under that
 chapter. The review shall be conducted as if the District were
 scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 4. LOWER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY. Chapter 8503,
 Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section
 8503.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 8503.0021.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The authority
 is subject to review for the purposes of Chapter 325, Government
 Code, but may not be abolished under that chapter. The review shall
 be conducted as if the authority were scheduled to be abolished
 September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.