Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB742 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 742
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2009; February 25, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 19, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 19, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications to serve as an associate judge or
 visiting associate judge in certain family law proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 201.1021, Family Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) To be eligible for appointment under this subchapter, a
 person must be[:
 [(1)] a citizen of the United States, [and] have
 resided in this state [the administrative judicial region, or a
 county adjacent to the region, in which the court to which the
 person is appointed is located] for the two years preceding the date
 of appointment,[;] and be:
 (1)  eligible for assignment under Section 74.054,
 Government Code, because the person is named on the list of retired
 and former judges maintained by the presiding judge of the
 administrative region under Section 74.055, Government Code; or
 (2) licensed to practice law in this state and have
 been a practicing lawyer in this state, or a judge of a court in this
 state who is not otherwise eligible under Subdivision (1), for the
 four years preceding the date of appointment.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 201.113, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A person is not eligible for appointment under this
 section unless the person has served as a [child support] master or
 associate judge under this chapter, a district judge, or a
 statutory county court judge for at least two years before the date
 of appointment.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 201.2021, Family Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) To be eligible for appointment under this subchapter, a
 person must be[:
 [(1)] a citizen of the United States, [and] have
 resided in this state [the administrative judicial region, or a
 county adjacent to the region, in which the court to which the
 person is appointed is located] for the two years preceding the date
 of appointment,[;] and be:
 (1)  eligible for assignment under Section 74.054,
 Government Code, because the person is named on the list of retired
 and former judges maintained by the presiding judge of the
 administrative region under Section 74.055, Government Code; or
 (2) licensed to practice law in this state and have
 been a practicing lawyer in this state, or a judge of a court in this
 state who is not otherwise eligible under Subdivision (1), for the
 four years preceding the date of appointment.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (c), Section 201.208, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) A person is not eligible for appointment under this
 section unless the person has served as a master or [an] associate
 judge under this chapter, a district judge, or a statutory county
 court judge for at least two years before the date of appointment.
 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (a), Section 201.1021, and Subsection (a), Section 201.2021, Family
 Code, apply only to the appointment of an associate judge under
 Subchapter B or C, Chapter 201, Family Code, on or after the
 effective date of this Act. The appointment of an associate judge
 before that date is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 appointment was made, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 6. The changes in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (b), Section 201.113, and Subsection (c), Section 201.208, Family
 Code, apply only to the appointment of a visiting associate judge
 under Subchapter B or C, Chapter 201, Family Code, on or after the
 effective date of this Act. The appointment of a visiting associate
 judge before that date is governed by the law in effect on the date
 the appointment was made, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *