Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB747 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 747
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2009; February 25, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 26, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 747 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of a hospital lien.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 55.005, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (d), (e),
 and (f) to read as follows:
 (a) To secure the lien, a hospital or emergency medical
 services provider must:
 (1)  provide notice to the injured individual in
 accordance with Subsection (d) or (e); and
 (2) file written notice of the lien with the county
 clerk of the county in which the services were provided[. The
 notice must be filed] before money is paid to an entitled person
 because of the injury.
 (b) The notice filed under Subsection (a)(2) must contain:
 (1) the injured individual's name and last known
 address;
 (2) the date of the accident;
 (3) the name and location of the hospital or emergency
 medical services provider claiming the lien; [and]
 (4) the name of the person alleged to be liable for
 damages arising from the injury, if known; and
 (5)  an affidavit by an agent of the hospital or
 emergency medical services provider that affirms that the notice to
 the injured individual was given in accordance with Subsection (d).
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (e), not later than the
 10th day before the date a hospital or emergency medical services
 provider files a notice with the county clerk under Subsection
 (a)(2), the hospital or emergency medical services provider must
 send a written notice to the injured individual by certified mail,
 return receipt requested, to the individual's last known address
 that states that:
 (1)  a hospital lien may attach to any cause of action
 or claim the individual may have against another person for the
 individual's injuries for any unpaid charges for hospital services
 or emergency medical services provided in connection with the
 injuries and specifies to whom the charges may be owed; and
 (2)  the hospital or emergency medical services
 provider may file a notice of a hospital lien with the county clerk
 of the county in which the services were provided, in accordance
 with Chapter 55, Property Code.
 (e)  A hospital or emergency medical services provider is not
 required to provide notice by mail if the hospital or emergency
 medical services provider provides the notice required by
 Subsection (d) to the injured individual at the time of the
 individual's admission to the hospital or at the time emergency
 medical services are provided if:
 (1)  the notice is provided in a written document
 separate from any other documents signed by or provided to the
 individual at the time of the individual's admission to the
 hospital or at the time the emergency medical services are
 provided; and
 (2)  the notice is signed by the injured individual or
 the injured individual's representative.
 (f)  The failure of an individual to receive a notice mailed
 in accordance with Subsection (d) does not affect the validity of a
 lien under this chapter.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a lien for services provided to an injured individual on or after
 the effective date of this Act. A lien for services provided before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *