Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB752 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis, Nelson S.B. No. 752
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2009; March 4, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 752 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a restriction on the formation in which certain
 commercial disposal wells permitted by the Railroad Commission of
 Texas may inject oil and gas waste.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 27, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 27.039 to read as follows:
 Sec. 27.039.  RESTRICTION ON CERTAIN COMMERCIAL DISPOSAL
 WELLS. (a)  This section applies only to a commercial disposal
 well, as defined by the railroad commission, proposed to be located
 in a county that:
 (1) has a population of more than 1.4 million; and
 (2)  is located wholly or partly above a
 hydrocarbon-producing geological formation in which during 2008
 the railroad commission issued more than 1,000 drilling permits
 authorizing gas or other wells to be completed.
 (b)  A permit issued by the railroad commission for a
 commercial disposal well, as defined by the railroad commission,
 that authorizes the disposal of oil and gas waste may authorize the
 disposal of the waste only in the Ellenberger formation or a deeper
 formation.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a permit application pending before the Railroad Commission of
 Texas on or after the effective date of this Act. A permit issued
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the permit was issued, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *