Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB755 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 755
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2009; March 4, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 755 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for a funeral establishment license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 651.351, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (i) to read as
 follows:
 (d) A funeral establishment must:
 (1) meet the building, fire safety, and health
 standards and health ordinances of this state and of the
 municipality in which the establishment is located;
 (2) except as provided by Subsection (i), be located
 at a fixed place that is not tax-exempt property or a cemetery;
 (3) include facilities in which funeral services may
 be conducted;
 (4) have access to rolling stock consisting of at
 least one motor hearse;
 (5) include a preparation room containing the
 facilities, equipment, and supplies required by commission rule to
 ensure the provision of adequate embalming services;
 (6) include other facilities as necessary to comply
 with the sanitary codes of this state and of the municipality in
 which the room is located; and
 (7) include a display containing sufficient
 merchandise to permit reasonable selection, including at least five
 adult caskets, two of which must be full-size.
 (i)  Subsection (d)(2) does not apply to a funeral
 establishment that is:
 (1)  located on the real property of a public junior
 college; and
 (2)  operated in connection with an accredited
 educational program in funeral services offered by the public
 junior college.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *