Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB768 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 768


 AN ACT
 relating to exemptions from the Texas Structural Pest Control Act;
 providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 1951, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 1951.058 and 1951.059 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1951.058.  ACTIVITIES NOT INVOLVING PESTICIDES. When
 performed without the use of a pesticide, this chapter does not
 apply to the:
 (1) use of a raptor to control or relocate other birds;
 (2)  physical removal of pests or the habitat of pests
 while cleaning a chimney;
 (3)  use of a live trap to remove an animal from the
 premises of a residence, agricultural operation, or business
 structure;
 (4)  removal by mechanical means of weeds or other
 obstructing vegetation from a sewer, drainage system, body of
 water, or similar area; or
 (5)  installation, maintenance, or use of a
 nonpesticidal barrier to remove or prevent infestation by nuisance
 animals.
 Sec. 1951.059.  ACTIVITIES INVOLVING MINIMAL RISK OF HARM.
 (a)  The department by rule may exempt an activity from all or part
 of the requirements of this chapter, other than a requirement under
 Section 1951.212, if the department determines that the activity
 presents only a minimal risk of harm to the health, safety, and
 welfare of the public, the person performing the activity, pets and
 other domesticated animals, and the environment.
 (b)  A business that performs an activity exempted from
 regulation under this section and that is not otherwise required to
 hold a license issued under this chapter shall provide to each
 customer a written notice, as prescribed by department rule, that:
 (1)  informs the customer of the customer's rights
 under the Deceptive Trade Practices-Consumer Protection Act
 (Subchapter E, Chapter 17, Business & Commerce Code);
 (2)  provides contact information for the consumer
 protection division of the office of the attorney general; and
 (3)  contains other information required by the
 department.
 (c)  Failure to provide the notice required by Subsection (b)
 is a violation of this chapter. The department may impose an
 administrative penalty or take any other enforcement action
 provided by this chapter or the Agriculture Code to deter,
 restrain, or punish a person who violates this section. An
 enforcement action by the department under this section is in
 addition to remedies and penalties provided by the Deceptive Trade
 Practices-Consumer Protection Act (Subchapter E, Chapter 17,
 Business & Commerce Code).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 768 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 768 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor