Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB779 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 779
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2009; March 4, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 26, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 779 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expedited credentialing for certain individual health
 care providers providing services under a managed care plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 1452, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. EXPEDITED CREDENTIALING PROCESS FOR INDIVIDUAL
 HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS WHO ARE NOT PHYSICIANS
 Sec. 1452.151. DEFINITIONS. (a) In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Applicant health care provider" means an
 individual who:
 (A)  is a health care provider described by
 Section 1452.101(3)(A); and
 (B)  is applying for expedited credentialing
 under this subchapter.
 (2) "Established professional group" means:
 (A)  a single legal entity owned by two or more
 health care providers;
 (B)  a professional association composed of
 licensed health care providers; or
 (C)  any other business entity composed of
 licensed health care providers permitted under the Occupations
 Code.
 (b)  "Enrollee," "health care provider," "managed care
 plan," and "participating provider" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 1452.101.
 Sec. 1452.152.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
 to an individual health care provider who:
 (1) is not a physician; and
 (2)  joins an established professional group of health
 care providers that has a contract in force with a managed care plan
 on the date the health care provider joins the group.
 Sec. 1452.153.  ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS. To qualify for
 expedited credentialing under this subchapter and payment under
 Section 1452.154, an applicant health care provider must:
 (1)  be licensed, certified, or otherwise authorized in
 this state by, and in good standing with, the agency of this state
 that issues the license, certification, or other authorization
 appropriate to the profession of the applicant health care
 provider;
 (2)  submit all documentation and other information
 required by the issuer of the managed care plan as necessary to
 enable the issuer to begin the credentialing process required by
 the issuer to include that type of health care provider in the
 issuer's health benefit plan network; and
 (3)  agree to comply with the terms of the managed care
 plan's participating provider contract currently in force with the
 applicant health care provider's established professional group.
 Sec. 1452.154.  PAYMENT OF APPLICANT HEALTH CARE PROVIDER
 DURING CREDENTIALING PROCESS. On submission by the applicant
 health care provider of the information required by the managed
 care plan issuer under Section 1452.153(2), and for payment
 purposes only, the issuer shall treat the applicant health care
 provider as if the applicant were a participating provider in the
 health benefit plan network when the applicant health care provider
 provides services to the managed care plan's enrollees, including:
 (1)  authorizing the applicant health care provider to
 collect copayments from the enrollees; and
 (2)  making payments to the applicant health care
 provider.
 Sec. 1452.155.  DIRECTORY ENTRIES. Pending the approval of
 an application submitted under Section 1452.154, the managed care
 plan may exclude the applicant health care provider from the
 managed care plan's directory of participating health care
 providers, the managed care plan's website listing of participating
 health care providers, or any other listing of participating health
 care providers.
 Sec. 1452.156.  EFFECT OF FAILURE TO MEET CREDENTIALING
 REQUIREMENTS. If, on completion of the credentialing process, the
 managed care plan issuer determines that the applicant health care
 provider does not meet the issuer's credentialing requirements:
 (1)  the managed care plan issuer may recover from the
 applicant health care provider or the applicant's established
 professional group an amount equal to the difference between
 payments for in-network benefits and out-of-network benefits; and
 (2)  the applicant health care provider or the
 applicant's established professional group may retain any
 copayments collected or in the process of being collected as of the
 date of the issuer's determination.
 Sec. 1452.157.  ENROLLEE HELD HARMLESS. An enrollee in the
 managed care plan is not responsible and shall be held harmless for
 the difference between in-network copayments paid by the enrollee
 to a health care provider who is determined to be ineligible under
 Section 1452.156 and the managed care plan's charges for
 out-of-network services. The health care provider and the
 provider's established professional group may not charge the
 enrollee for any portion of the provider's fee that is not paid or
 reimbursed by the enrollee's managed care plan.
 Sec. 1452.158.  LIMITATION ON MANAGED CARE ISSUER LIABILITY.
 A managed care plan issuer that complies with this subchapter is not
 subject to liability for damages arising out of or in connection
 with, directly or indirectly, the payment by the issuer of an
 applicant health care provider as if the applicant were a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan network.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (c), Section 843.203, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) For purposes of this subchapter, an applicant
 physician, as defined by Subchapter C, Chapter 1452, or an
 applicant health care provider, as defined by Subchapter D, Chapter
 1452, may not be considered to be an available primary care
 physician or primary care provider within the health maintenance
 organization delivery network for selection by an enrollee.
 SECTION 3. Section 843.304, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Subchapter D, Chapter 1452, does not affect the
 authority of a health maintenance organization under Subsection
 (c), (d), or (e).
 SECTION 4. Section 1301.051, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Subchapter D, Chapter 1452, does not affect the
 authority of an insurer under Subsection (d).
 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to credentialing of an individual health care provider under a
 contract entered into or renewed by an established professional
 group and an issuer of a managed care plan on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A contract entered into or renewed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before that date, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *