Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB808 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 808


 AN ACT
 relating to allowing certain claimants to file an application under
 the Crime Victims' Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 56.37, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  For a claim that is based on criminally injurious
 conduct in violation of Chapter 19, Penal Code, the claimant must
 file an application not later than three years after the date the
 identity of the victim is established by a law enforcement agency.
 SECTION 2. Article 56.61, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 56.61. COMPENSATION FOR CERTAIN CRIMINALLY INJURIOUS
 CONDUCT PROHIBITED; EXCEPTION. (a)  Except as provided by
 Subsection (b), the [The] attorney general may not award
 compensation for pecuniary [economic] loss arising from criminally
 injurious conduct that occurred before January 1, 1980.
 (b)  The attorney general may award compensation for
 pecuniary loss arising from criminally injurious conduct that
 occurred before January 1, 1980, if:
 (1)  the conduct was in violation of Chapter 19, Penal
 Code;
 (2)  the identity of the victim is established by a law
 enforcement agency on or after September 1, 2009; and
 (3)  the claimant files the application for
 compensation within the limitations period provided by Article
 56.37(e).
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to criminally injurious conduct committed against a victim whose
 identity is established by a law enforcement agency on or after the
 effective date of this Act. Criminally injurious conduct committed
 against a victim whose identity is established by a law enforcement
 agency before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law
 in effect on the date the victim's identity was established, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 808 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 808 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor