Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB839 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 839


 AN ACT
 relating to the punishment for a capital felony committed by a
 juvenile whose case is transferred to criminal court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 12.31, Penal Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 12.31. CAPITAL FELONY. (a) An individual adjudged
 guilty of a capital felony in a case in which the state seeks the
 death penalty shall be punished by imprisonment in the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice [institutional division] for life
 without parole or by death. An individual adjudged guilty of a
 capital felony in a case in which the state does not seek the death
 penalty shall be punished by imprisonment in the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice [institutional division] for:
 (1)  life, if the individual's case was transferred to
 the court under Section 54.02, Family Code; or
 (2) life without parole.
 (b) In a capital felony trial in which the state seeks the
 death penalty, prospective jurors shall be informed that a sentence
 of life imprisonment without parole or death is mandatory on
 conviction of a capital felony. In a capital felony trial in which
 the state does not seek the death penalty, prospective jurors shall
 be informed that the state is not seeking the death penalty and
 that:
 (1)  a sentence of life imprisonment is mandatory on
 conviction of the capital felony, if the case was transferred to the
 court under Section 54.02, Family Code; or
 (2) a sentence of life imprisonment without parole is
 mandatory on conviction of the capital felony.
 SECTION 2. Section 508.145, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  An inmate serving a life sentence under Section
 12.31(a)(1), Penal Code, for a capital felony is not eligible for
 release on parole until the actual calendar time the inmate has
 served, without consideration of good conduct time, equals 40
 calendar years.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 839 passed the Senate on
 April 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 839 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 101,
 Nays 37, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor