Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB847 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 847
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2009; March 4, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to applicability of fee exemptions for military personnel
 and their children to certain course fees charged by public
 technical institutes and public state colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (g), Section 54.203, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (g) The governing board of a public junior college, public
 technical institute, or public state college, as those terms are
 defined by Section 61.003, [district] may establish a fee for
 extraordinary costs associated with a specific course or program
 and may provide that the exemptions provided by Subsections (a) and
 (b) do not apply to this fee.
 SECTION 2. Section 54.203, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with fees charged for the 2009 fall
 semester. Fees charged for an academic period before that semester
 are covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *