Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB872 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio, et al. S.B. No. 872


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continued health insurance coverage for eligible
 survivors of certain public servants killed in the line of duty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 615.073, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The surviving spouse is entitled to continue to purchase
 health insurance coverage until [the earlier of:
 [(1) the date the surviving spouse remarries;
 [(2)     the date the surviving spouse becomes eligible
 for group health insurance through another employer; or
 [(3)] the date the surviving spouse becomes eligible
 for federal Medicare benefits.
 SECTION 2. Section 615.074, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 615.074. BENEFIT TO DEPENDENT. (a) An eligible
 surviving dependent who is a minor child is entitled to continue
 health insurance coverage until [the earlier of:
 [(1)] the date the dependent reaches the age of 18
 [years; or
 [(2)     the date the dependent becomes eligible for group
 health insurance through another employer].
 (b) An eligible surviving dependent who is not a minor child
 is entitled to continue health insurance coverage until the earlier
 of:
 (1) [the date the dependent marries;
 [(2)] the date the dependent becomes eligible for
 group health insurance through another employer; or
 (2) [(3)] the date the dependent becomes eligible for
 federal Medicare benefits.
 SECTION 3. Subsections (a) and (c), Section 615.075,
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) An employing entity shall provide written notice to an
 eligible survivor to whom this subchapter may apply of the
 survivor's rights under this subchapter not later than the 10th day
 after the date of the decedent's death. Not later than the 150th
 day after the date of the decedent's death, the employing entity
 shall send a subsequent written notice under this subsection by
 certified mail to any eligible survivor who has not already elected
 to continue coverage on or before that date.
 (c) To receive continued coverage under this subchapter,
 the employing entity must be informed not later than the 180th
 [90th] day after the date the decedent died that the eligible
 survivor elects to continue coverage.
 SECTION 4. Section 615.077, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 615.077. PAYMENTS; RATE. An eligible survivor who is
 entitled to continued coverage under this subchapter [is entitled
 to]:
 (1) is entitled to:
 (A) make payments for the coverage or have
 payments made on the survivor's behalf at the same time and to the
 same entity that payments for coverage are made by current
 employees of the employing entity; and
 (B) obtain [(2) purchase] the coverage at the
 [group] rate paid by current employees of the employing entity for
 that coverage; and
 (2)  may not be required to pay a premium amount for the
 coverage that is greater than the premium amount that a current
 employee of the employing entity without a spouse is required to pay
 to cover the employee alone or to cover the employee and the
 employee's dependent children, as applicable to the eligible
 survivor [that exists at the time of payment].
 SECTION 5. Subchapter D, Chapter 615, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 615.080 and 615.081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 615.080.  GRACE PERIOD. Health insurance benefits
 coverage in force on the date of the decedent's death under which a
 deceased individual listed under Section 615.071 covered one or
 more other persons may not lapse before the 181st day after the date
 of the decedent's death for failure to pay the premium.
 Sec. 615.081.  LIMITED OPPORTUNITY FOR CERTAIN ELIGIBLE
 SURVIVORS TO REAPPLY FOR COVERAGE. (a)  This section applies only
 to an eligible survivor of a deceased individual listed under
 Section 615.071 who died on or after September 1, 1993.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter
 or other law, an eligible survivor to whom this section applies who
 did not purchase continued health insurance benefits under this
 subchapter or under the law codified by this subchapter within the
 time allowed after the listed individual's death, or who
 discontinued coverage under this subchapter or under the law
 codified by this subchapter after the listed individual's death,
 may reapply for coverage under the employing entity's health
 insurance benefits plan not later than March 1, 2010.
 (c)  An eligible survivor who reapplies for coverage under
 Subsection (b) is entitled to purchase the coverage according to
 the same rate schedule and coverage options as would apply had the
 eligible survivor continued coverage under this subchapter after
 the listed individual's death.
 (d) This section expires September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.