Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB894 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson, Davis S.B. No. 894
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 17, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal investment of public funds received from the
 management and development of mineral rights.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 2256, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2256.0202 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2256.0202.  AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS:  MUNICIPAL FUNDS
 FROM MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF MINERAL RIGHTS.  (a)  In
 addition to other investments authorized under this subchapter, a
 municipality may invest funds received by the municipality from a
 lease or contract for the management and development of land owned
 by the municipality and leased for oil, gas, or other mineral
 development in any investment authorized to be made by a trustee
 under Subtitle B, Title 9, Property Code (Texas Trust Code).
 (b)  Funds invested by a municipality under this section
 shall be segregated and accounted for separately from other funds
 of the municipality.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *