Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB896 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 896
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 8, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 780.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 780.002. DEPOSITS TO ACCOUNT. The comptroller shall
 deposit any gifts, grants, donations, and legislative
 appropriations made for that purpose to the credit of the
 designated trauma facility and emergency medical services account
 established under Section 780.003. [(a)     On the first Monday of
 each month, the Department of Public Safety shall remit the
 surcharges collected during the previous month under the driver
 responsibility program operated by that department under Chapter
 708, Transportation Code, to the comptroller.
 [(b)     The comptroller shall deposit 49.5 percent of the money
 received under Subsection (a) to the credit of the account
 established under this chapter and 49.5 percent of the money to the
 general revenue fund. The remaining one percent of the amount of
 the surcharges shall be deposited to the general revenue fund and
 may be appropriated only to the Department of Public Safety for
 administration of the driver responsibility program operated by
 that department under Chapter 708, Transportation Code.
 [(c)     Notwithstanding Subsection (b), in any state fiscal
 year the comptroller shall deposit 49.5 percent of the surcharges
 collected under Chapter 708, Transportation Code, to the credit of
 the general revenue fund only until the total amount of the
 surcharges deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund
 under Subsection (b), and the state traffic fines deposited to the
 credit of that fund under Section 542.4031(g)(1), Transportation
 Code, equals $250 million for that year. If in any state fiscal
 year the amount received by the comptroller under those laws for
 deposit to the credit of the general revenue fund exceeds $250
 million, the comptroller shall deposit the additional amount to the
 credit of the Texas mobility fund.]
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 502.1715,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) Fees collected under this section shall be deposited to
 the credit of the state highway fund. Subject to appropriations,
 the money shall be used by the Department of Public Safety to:
 (1) support the Department of Public Safety's
 reengineering of the driver's license system to provide for the
 issuance by the Department of Public Safety of a driver's license or
 personal identification certificate, to include use of image
 comparison technology; and
 (2) [establish and maintain a system to support the
 driver responsibility program under Chapter 708; and
 [(3)] make lease payments to the master lease purchase
 program for the financing of the driver's license reengineering
 project.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (h), Section 542.4031,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (h) Notwithstanding Subsection (g)(1), in any state fiscal
 year the comptroller shall deposit 67 percent of the money received
 under Subsection (e)(2) to the credit of the general revenue fund
 only until the total amount of the money deposited to the credit of
 the general revenue fund under Subsection (g)(1) [and Section
 780.002(b), Health and Safety Code,] equals $250 million for that
 year. If in any state fiscal year the amount received by the
 comptroller under Subsection (g)(1) [those laws] for deposit to the
 credit of the general revenue fund exceeds $250 million, the
 comptroller shall deposit the additional amount to the credit of
 the Texas mobility fund.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (a), Section 601.233, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A citation for an offense under Section 601.191 issued
 as a result of Section 601.053 must include, in type larger than
 other type on the citation, [except for the type of the statement
 required by Section 708.105,] the following statement:
 "A second or subsequent conviction of an offense under
 the Texas Motor Vehicle Safety Responsibility Act will
 result in the suspension of your driver's license and
 motor vehicle registration unless you file and
 maintain evidence of financial responsibility with the
 Department of Public Safety for two years from the date
 of conviction. The department may waive the
 requirement to file evidence of financial
 responsibility if you file satisfactory evidence with
 the department showing that at the time this citation
 was issued, the vehicle was covered by a motor vehicle
 liability insurance policy or that you were otherwise
 exempt from the requirements to provide evidence of
 financial responsibility."
 SECTION 5. Chapter 708, Transportation Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6. Notwithstanding the repeal by this Act of
 Chapter 708, Transportation Code, a surcharge imposed under former
 Chapter 708 of that code before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the applicable law in effect before the effective date
 of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *