Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB911 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 911
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 911 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the certification and regulation of pain management
 clinics.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 167 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 167. REGULATION OF PAIN MANAGEMENT CLINICS
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 167.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "pain
 management clinic" means a publicly or privately owned facility for
 which a majority of patients are issued on a monthly basis a
 prescription for opioids, benzodiazepines, barbiturates, or
 carisoprodol, but not including suboxone.
 Sec. 167.002. EXEMPTIONS. This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  a medical or dental school or an outpatient clinic
 associated with a medical or dental school;
 (2)  a hospital, including any outpatient facility or
 clinic of a hospital;
 (3)  a hospice established under 40 T.A.C. Section
 97.403 or defined by 42 C.F.R. Section 418.3;
 (4) a facility maintained or operated by this state;
 (5)  a clinic maintained or operated by the United
 States;
 (6)  a health organization certified by the board under
 Section 162.001; or
 (7)  a clinic owned or operated by a physician who
 treats patients within the physician's area of specialty and who
 uses other forms of treatment, including surgery, with the issuance
 of a prescription for a majority of the patients.
 [Sections 167.003-167.050 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES OF BOARD
 Sec. 167.051.  ADOPTION OF RULES. The board shall adopt
 rules necessary to implement this chapter, including rules to
 address, for a pain management clinic:
 (1) the operation of the clinic;
 (2)  personnel requirements for the clinic, including
 requirements for a physician who practices at a clinic;
 (3) standards to ensure quality of patient care;
 (4)  certificate application and renewal procedures
 and requirements;
 (5) inspections and complaint investigations; and
 (6) patient billing procedures.
 Sec. 167.052.  INSPECTIONS. The board may inspect a pain
 management clinic, including the documents of a physician
 practicing at the clinic, as necessary to ensure compliance with
 this chapter.
 Sec. 167.053.  COMPLAINTS. The board shall investigate a
 complaint alleging a violation of this chapter or a rule adopted
 under this chapter by a pain management clinic certified under this
 chapter or a physician who owns or operates a clinic in the same
 manner as other complaints under this subtitle.
 [Sections 167.054-167.100 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER C. CERTIFICATION OF CLINIC
 Sec. 167.101.  CERTIFICATE REQUIRED. (a)  A pain management
 clinic may not operate in this state unless the clinic is certified
 under this chapter.
 (b)  A certificate issued under this chapter is not
 transferable or assignable.
 Sec. 167.102.  CERTIFICATE APPLICATION AND ISSUANCE. (a)  A
 physician who owns or operates a pain management clinic shall apply
 for a certificate for the clinic under this chapter. A pain
 management clinic must be owned and operated by a medical director
 who is a physician who practices in this state under an unrestricted
 license.
 (b)  An applicant for a certificate under this chapter must
 submit an application to the board on a form prescribed by the
 board.
 (c)  The board shall issue a certificate if the board finds
 that the pain management clinic meets the requirements of this
 chapter and the standards adopted by the board under this chapter.
 [Sections 167.103-167.150 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER D. CERTIFICATE RENEWAL
 Sec. 167.151.  EXPIRATION OF CERTIFICATE. (a)  A
 certificate issued under this chapter expires on the second
 anniversary of the date it is issued.
 (b)  The board shall grant a 180-day grace period from the
 expiration date of a certificate to renew the certificate.
 (c)  The owner or operator of a pain management clinic for
 which a certificate has expired may not continue to operate the
 clinic until the clinic's certificate is renewed.
 Sec. 167.152.  REQUIREMENTS FOR RENEWAL. (a)  The owner or
 operator of a pain management clinic may apply to renew a
 certificate issued to the clinic under this chapter by:
 (1)  submitting a renewal application to the board on
 the form prescribed by the board before the expiration of the grace
 period under Section 167.151; and
 (2)  complying with any other requirements adopted by
 board rule.
 (b)  If a certificate is not renewed before the expiration of
 the grace period under Section 167.151, the pain management clinic
 must reapply for an original certificate to operate the clinic.
 [Sections 167.153-167.200 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER E. REGULATION OF CLINICS; ENFORCEMENT
 Sec. 167.201.  REGULATION OF PERSON AFFILIATED WITH CLINIC.
 (a)  The owner or operator of a pain management clinic, an employee
 of the clinic, or a person with whom a clinic contracts for services
 may not:
 (1)  have been denied, by any jurisdiction, a license
 under which the person may prescribe, dispense, administer, supply,
 or sell a controlled substance;
 (2)  have held a license issued by any jurisdiction,
 under which the person may prescribe, dispense, administer, supply,
 or sell a controlled substance, that has been restricted; or
 (3)  have been subject to disciplinary action by any
 licensing entity for conduct that was a result of inappropriately
 prescribing, dispensing, administering, supplying, or selling a
 controlled substance.
 (b)  A pain management clinic may not be owned wholly or
 partly by a person who has been convicted of or pled nolo contendere
 to:
 (1) an offense that constitutes a felony; or
 (2)  an offense that constitutes a misdemeanor, the
 facts of which relate to the distribution of illegal prescription
 drugs or a controlled substance as defined by Section 551.003(11).
 (c) The owner or operator of a pain management clinic shall:
 (1)  be on-site at the clinic at least 33 percent of the
 clinic's total number of operating hours; and
 (2)  review at least 33 percent of the total number of
 patient files of the clinic, including the patient files of a clinic
 employee or contractor to whom authority for patient care has been
 delegated by the clinic.
 Sec. 167.202.  DISCIPLINARY ACTION. (a)  A violation of
 this chapter or a rule adopted under this chapter is grounds for
 disciplinary action against a pain management clinic certified
 under this chapter or an owner or operator of a clinic certified
 under this chapter.
 (b)  A violation of this chapter may be enforced in the same
 manner as any other violation of this subtitle.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than March 1, 2010, the Texas
 Medical Board shall adopt the rules required by Chapter 167,
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Notwithstanding Section 167.101, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act, a pain management clinic must obtain a
 certificate required by that section not later than September 1,
 2010.
 SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Section 167.101, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
 takes effect September 1, 2010.
 * * * * *