Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB912 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 912
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 912 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the diversion of a controlled substance by certain
 persons who have access to the substance by virtue of the person's
 profession or employment; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 481, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 481.1285 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.1285.  OFFENSE:  DIVERSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
 BY REGISTRANTS, DISPENSERS, AND CERTAIN OTHER PERSONS. (a)  This
 section applies only to a registrant, a dispenser, or a person who,
 pursuant to Section 481.062(a)(1) or (2), is not required to
 register under this subchapter.
 (b) A person commits an offense if the person knowingly:
 (1)  converts to the person's own use or benefit a
 controlled substance to which the person has access by virtue of the
 person's profession or employment; or
 (2)  diverts to the unlawful use or benefit of another
 person a controlled substance to which the person has access by
 virtue of the person's profession or employment.
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (b)(1) is a state jail
 felony.  An offense under Subsection (b)(2) is a felony of the third
 degree.
 (d)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *