Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB926 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 926
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 1, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 1, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 926 By: Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the imposition of a civil penalty against the owner of
 an authorized emergency vehicle for a violation recorded by a
 photographic traffic signal enforcement system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 707, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 707.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 707.0021.  IMPOSITION OF CIVIL PENALTY ON OWNER OF
 AUTHORIZED EMERGENCY VEHICLE. (a)  In this section, "authorized
 emergency vehicle" has the meaning assigned by Section 541.201.
 (b)  A local authority may not impose or attempt to impose a
 civil penalty under this chapter on the owner of an authorized
 emergency vehicle.
 (c)  This section does not prohibit an employer from taking
 disciplinary action against an employee who as the operator of an
 authorized emergency vehicle operated the vehicle in violation of a
 rule or policy of the employer.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *