Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB927 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 927
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 25, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tampering with a direct recording electronic voting
 machine.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 33.05, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  With the consent of the appropriate local county or
 district attorney, the attorney general has concurrent
 jurisdiction with that consenting local prosecutor to investigate
 or prosecute an offense under this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *