Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB935 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 935
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing a judge of a municipal court to conduct a
 marriage ceremony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 2.202, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The following persons are authorized to conduct a
 marriage ceremony:
 (1) a licensed or ordained Christian minister or
 priest;
 (2) a Jewish rabbi;
 (3) a person who is an officer of a religious
 organization and who is authorized by the organization to conduct a
 marriage ceremony; and
 (4) a justice of the supreme court, judge of the court
 of criminal appeals, justice of the courts of appeals, judge of the
 district, county, and probate courts, judge of the county courts at
 law, judge of the courts of domestic relations, judge of the
 juvenile courts, retired justice or judge of those courts, justice
 of the peace, retired justice of the peace, judge of a municipal
 court, or judge or magistrate of a federal court of this state.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a marriage ceremony that is conducted on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A marriage ceremony conducted before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the ceremony was conducted, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *