Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB937 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 937
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 937 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of and punishment for certain criminal
 offenses involving a criminal street gang.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (e), Section 15.031, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e) An offense under this section is one category lower than
 the solicited offense, except that an offense under this section is
 the same category as the solicited offense if it is shown on the
 trial of the offense that the actor:
 (1)  was at the time of the offense 17 years of age or
 older and a member of a criminal street gang, as defined by Section
 71.01; and
 (2) committed the offense with the intent to:
 (A)  further the criminal activities of the
 criminal street gang; or
 (B)  avoid detection as a member of a criminal
 street gang.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 22.015, Penal Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  "Family" has the meaning assigned by Section
 71.003, Family Code.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 22.015, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A person commits an offense if, with intent to coerce,
 induce, or solicit a child to actively participate in the
 activities of a criminal street gang, the person:
 (1) threatens the child or a member of the child's
 family with imminent bodily injury; or
 (2) causes bodily injury to the child or a member of
 the child's family.
 SECTION 4. Chapter 33, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 33.06 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.06.  ONLINE HARASSMENT TO FURTHER INTERESTS OF
 CRIMINAL STREET GANG. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commercial social networking site" means any
 business, organization, or other similar entity operating a website
 that permits persons to become registered users for the purpose of
 establishing personal relationships with other users through
 direct or real-time communication with other users or the creation
 of web pages or profiles available to the public or to other users.
 The term does not include an electronic mail program.
 (2)  "Criminal street gang" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 71.01.
 (3)  "Electronic communication" means the transmission
 of a sign, signal, writing, image, sound, text, or other data
 through the use of an electronic device, including a telephone,
 cellular telephone, text messaging device, personal data
 assistant, computer, or wireless communications device.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person sends an
 electronic communication or posts a message on an electronic
 message board or commercial social networking site with the intent
 to:
 (1)  abuse, intimidate, harass, alarm, or threaten
 another person; and
 (2)  benefit, promote, or further the interests of a
 criminal street gang.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is a Class A misdemeanor if the actor has
 previously been convicted under this section.
 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *