By: Watson S.B. No. 939 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2009; March 9, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 31, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 939 By: Davis A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a memorandum of understanding between the Texas Education Agency and the Department of Family and Protective Services addressing exchange of information regarding students in foster care. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 7, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 7.029 to read as follows: Sec. 7.029. MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION FOR STUDENTS IN FOSTER CARE. (a) The agency and the Department of Family and Protective Services shall enter into a memorandum of understanding regarding the exchange of information as appropriate to facilitate the department's evaluation of educational outcomes of students in foster care. The memorandum of understanding must require: (1) the department to provide the agency each year with demographic information regarding individual students who during the preceding school year were in the conservatorship of the department following an adversarial hearing under Section 262.201, Family Code; and (2) the agency, in a manner consistent with federal law, to provide the department with aggregate information regarding educational outcomes of students for whom the agency received demographic information under Subdivision (1). (b) For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), information regarding educational outcomes includes information relating to student academic achievement, graduation rates, school attendance, disciplinary actions, and receipt of special education services. (c) The department may authorize the agency to provide education research centers established under Section 1.005 with demographic information regarding individual students received by the agency in accordance with Subsection (a)(1), as appropriate to allow the centers to perform additional analysis regarding educational outcomes of students in foster care. Any use of information regarding individual students provided to a center under this subsection must be approved by the department. (d) Nothing in this section may be construed to: (1) require the agency or the department to collect or maintain additional information regarding students in foster care; or (2) allow the release of information regarding an individual student in a manner not permitted under the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (20 U.S.C. Section 1232g) or another state or federal law. SECTION 2. The Texas Education Agency and the Department of Family and Protective Services shall enter into the memorandum of understanding required by Section 7.029, Education Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *