Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB958 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 958


 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain
 aircraft, including machinery and equipment used in an agricultural
 aircraft operation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 151.316, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The following items are exempted from the taxes imposed
 by this chapter:
 (1) horses, mules, and work animals;
 (2) animal life the products of which ordinarily
 constitute food for human consumption;
 (3) feed for farm and ranch animals;
 (4) feed for animals that are held for sale in the
 regular course of business;
 (5) seeds and annual plants the products of which:
 (A) ordinarily constitute food for human
 consumption;
 (B) are to be sold in the regular course of
 business; or
 (C) are used to produce feed for animals exempted
 by this section;
 (6) fertilizers, fungicides, insecticides,
 herbicides, defoliants, and desiccants exclusively used or
 employed on a farm or ranch in the production of:
 (A) food for human consumption;
 (B) feed for animal life; or
 (C) other agricultural products to be sold in the
 regular course of business;
 (7) machinery and equipment exclusively used or
 employed on a farm or ranch in the building or maintaining of roads
 or water facilities or in the production of:
 (A) food for human consumption;
 (B) grass;
 (C) feed for animal life; or
 (D) other agricultural products to be sold in the
 regular course of business;
 (8) machinery and equipment exclusively used in, and
 pollution control equipment required as a result of, the
 processing, packing, or marketing of agricultural products by an
 original producer at a location operated by the original producer
 for processing, packing, or marketing the producer's own products
 if:
 (A) 50 percent or more of the products processed,
 packed, or marketed at or from the location are produced by the
 original producer and not purchased or acquired from others; and
 (B) the producer does not process, pack, or
 market for consideration any agricultural products that belong to
 other persons in an amount greater than five percent of the total
 agricultural products processed, packed, or marketed by the
 producer; [and]
 (9) ice exclusively used by commercial fishing boats
 in the storing of aquatic species including but not limited to
 shrimp, other crustaceans, finfish, mollusks, and other similar
 creatures; and
 (10)  machinery and equipment exclusively used in an
 agricultural aircraft operation, as defined by 14 C.F.R. Section
 137.3.
 SECTION 2. Section 151.328, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (h) to read
 as follows:
 (a) Aircraft are exempted from the taxes imposed by this
 chapter if:
 (1) sold to a person using the aircraft as a
 certificated or licensed carrier of persons or property;
 (2) sold to a person who:
 (A) has a sales tax permit issued under this
 chapter; and
 (B) uses the aircraft for the purpose of
 providing flight instruction that is:
 (i) recognized by the Federal Aviation
 Administration;
 (ii) under the direct or general
 supervision of a flight instructor certified by the Federal
 Aviation Administration; and
 (iii) designed to lead to a pilot
 certificate or rating issued by the Federal Aviation Administration
 or otherwise required by a rule or regulation of the Federal
 Aviation Administration;
 (3) sold to a foreign government; [or]
 (4) sold in this state to a person for use and
 registration in another state or nation before any use in this state
 other than flight training in the aircraft and the transportation
 of the aircraft out of this state; or
 (5)  sold in this state to a person for use exclusively
 in connection with an agricultural use, as defined by Section
 23.51, and used for:
 (A) predator control;
 (B) wildlife or livestock capture;
 (C) wildlife or livestock surveys;
 (D) census counts of wildlife or livestock;
 (E)  animal or plant health inspection services;
 or
 (F) crop dusting, pollination, or seeding.
 (b) Repair, remodeling, and maintenance services to
 aircraft, including an engine or other component part of aircraft,
 operated by a person described by Subsection (a)(1), [or] (a)(2),
 or (a)(5) are exempted from the taxes imposed by this chapter.
 (h)  For purposes of the exemption under Subsection (a)(5),
 an aircraft is considered to be for use exclusively in connection
 with an agricultural use if 95 percent of the use of the aircraft is
 for a purpose described by Subsections (a)(5)(A)-(F). Travel of
 less than 30 miles each way to a location to perform a service
 described by Subsections (a)(5)(A)-(F) does not disqualify an
 aircraft from the exemption under Subsection (a)(5). A person who
 claims an exemption under Subsection (a)(5) must maintain and make
 available to the comptroller flight records for all uses of the
 aircraft.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 151.328, Tax Code, are a clarification of existing law and do not
 imply that the former law may be construed as inconsistent with the
 law as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 958 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 958 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor