Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB983 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis, et al. S.B. No. 983
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 983 By: Shapleigh


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing certain documents and training to children in
 the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective
 Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 264.014, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 264.014. PROVISION OF COPIES OF CERTAIN RECORDS. If,
 at the time a child is discharged from foster care, the child is at
 least 18 years of age or has had the disabilities of minority
 removed, the department shall provide to the child, not later than
 the 30th day before [after] the date the child is discharged from
 foster care, a copy of:
 (1) the child's birth certificate;
 (2) the child's immunization records; [and]
 (3) the information contained in the child's health
 passport;
 (4)  a personal identification certificate under
 Chapter 521, Transportation Code;
 (5)  a social security card or a replacement social
 security card, if appropriate; and
 (6) proof of enrollment in Medicaid, if appropriate.
 SECTION 2. (a) The Department of Family and Protective
 Services, in cooperation with the Texas Education Agency and the
 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, shall develop a
 plan to ensure that each child in the permanent managing
 conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services
 is provided the opportunity to complete a driver's education course
 and to obtain a driver's license before the child leaves
 conservatorship.
 (b) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall report to the legislature the
 results of the plan under Subsection (a) of this section. The
 report must include cost estimates for providing the driver's
 education and methods for obtaining affordable liability insurance
 for foster children.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 264.014, Family Code, apply to any child in the conservatorship of
 the Department of Family and Protective Services on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *