Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB987 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro S.B. No. 987
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 13, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the age at which transition planning begins for a public
 school student receiving special education services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 29.011, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 29.011. TRANSITION PLANNING. The commissioner shall
 by rule adopt procedures for compliance with federal requirements
 relating to transition services for students who are enrolled in
 special education programs under this subchapter. The procedures
 must:
 (1)  provide that transition planning begins for a
 student not later than when the student reaches 14 years of age; and
 (2) specify the manner in which a student's admission,
 review, and dismissal committee must consider, and if appropriate,
 address the following issues in the student's individualized
 education program:
 (A) [(1)] appropriate student involvement in the
 student's transition to life outside the public school system;
 (B) [(2)] if the student is younger than 18 years
 of age, appropriate parental involvement in the student's
 transition;
 (C) [(3)] if the student is at least 18 years of
 age, appropriate parental involvement in the student's transition,
 if the parent is invited to participate by the student or the school
 district in which the student is enrolled;
 (D) [(4)] any postsecondary education options;
 (E) [(5)] a functional vocational evaluation;
 (F) [(6)] employment goals and objectives;
 (G) [(7)] if the student is at least 18 years of
 age, the availability of age-appropriate instructional
 environments;
 (H) [(8)] independent living goals and
 objectives; and
 (I) [(9)] appropriate circumstances for
 referring a student or the student's parents to a governmental
 agency for services.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *