Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR25 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris, Shapiro, Nelson S.J.R. No. 25
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment requiring certain revenue
 collected by a public entity from the use of a tolled highway
 project in this state to be used only for transportation projects.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  Revenue collected by a public entity from the use
 of a tolled highway project in this state that is not dedicated to
 repayment of debt for the project may be used only for the
 acquisition, construction, operation, maintenance, or improvement
 of transportation projects.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment requiring certain
 revenue collected by a public entity from the use of a tolled
 highway project in this state to be used only for transportation
 projects."
 * * * * *