Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR43 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.J.R. No. 43
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 28, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 28, 2009, sent to printer.)


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the imposition of
 an additional ad valorem tax for emergency services districts,
 subject to voter approval, at a rate not to exceed five cents for
 the acquisition of land, equipment, or apparatus or the
 construction of capital improvements.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 48-e, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 48-e. Laws may be enacted to provide for the
 establishment and creation of special districts to provide
 emergency services and to authorize the commissioners courts of
 participating counties to impose [levy] a tax on the ad valorem
 property situated in said districts not to exceed 10 cents [Ten
 Cents (10)] on the $100 [One Hundred Dollars ($100.00)] valuation
 for the operating and capital support thereof and five cents on the
 $100 valuation for the acquisition of land, equipment, or apparatus
 or the construction of capital improvements; provided that no tax
 shall be imposed [levied] in support of said districts until
 approved by a vote of the qualified voters residing therein. Such a
 district may provide emergency medical services, emergency
 ambulance services, rural fire prevention and control services, or
 other emergency services authorized by the Legislature.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to authorize the
 imposition of an additional ad valorem tax for an emergency
 services district, subject to voter approval, at a rate not to
 exceed five cents for the acquisition of land, equipment, or
 apparatus or the construction of capital improvements."
 * * * * *