Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR50 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.J.R. No. 50
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the issuance of
 additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development
 Board.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-d-11 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-d-11.  ISSUANCE OF ADDITIONAL GENERAL OBLIGATION
 BONDS.  (a)  In addition to other bonds authorized by this article,
 the Texas Water Development Board may issue additional general
 obligation bonds, at its determination and on a continuing basis,
 for one or more accounts of the Texas Water Development Fund II, in
 amounts such that the aggregate principal amount of the bonds
 issued under this section does not exceed $6 billion outstanding at
 any one time.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) of this section,
 Section 49-d-8 of this article applies to the bonds authorized by
 this section.
 (c)  The limitation provided by Section 49-d-8 of this
 article that the Texas Water Development Board may not issue bonds
 in excess of the aggregate principal amount of previously
 authorized bonds does not apply to the bonds authorized by and
 issued under this section.
 (d)  A limitation on the percentage of state participation in
 any single project imposed by this article does not apply to a
 project funded with the proceeds of bonds issued under the
 authority of this section or Section 49-d-8 of this article.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment allowing the issuance
 of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water
 Development Board not to exceed $6 billion outstanding at any
 time."
 * * * * *