Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR6 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R825 SLB-D
 By: Ellis S.J.R. No. 6


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the dedication of
 the revenue received from the sporting goods sales tax.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a) For each state fiscal year, the revenue
 received from the collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale,
 storage, or use of sporting goods that were subject to taxation on
 January 1, 2009, under Chapter 151, Tax Code, is appropriated to the
 Parks and Wildlife Department and to the Texas Historical
 Commission or to their successors in function.
 (b)  Money dedicated as provided by Subsection (a) of this
 section:
 (1)  is automatically appropriated when received by the
 state;
 (2)  shall be proportionally deposited, as specified by
 general law, to the credit of the following Parks and Wildlife
 Department and Texas Historical Commission accounts, as the
 allocation to those accounts existed on January 1, 2009, or to the
 successor to those accounts:
 (A) the state parks account;
 (B) the Texas recreation and parks account;
 (C)  the large county and municipality recreation
 and parks account;
 (D)  the Texas parks and wildlife conservation and
 capital account; and
 (E) the historic site account; and
 (3)  may be used only as provided by the general law
 governing the use of money in the accounts described by Subsection
 (b)(2) of this section.
 (c)  In this section, "sporting goods" means an item of
 tangible personal property designed and sold for use in a sport or
 sporting activity, excluding apparel and footwear except that which
 is suitable only for use in a sport or sporting activity, and
 excluding board games, electronic games and similar devices,
 aircraft and powered vehicles, and replacement parts and
 accessories for any excluded item.
 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, requiring the revenue received from the
 collection of the taxes imposed on the sale, storage, or use of
 sporting goods to be appropriated only to the Parks and Wildlife
 Department and the Texas Historical Commission.
 (b)  Section 7-c, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2011, and applies only to state tax revenues
 that are collected on or after that date.
 (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment requiring the revenue
 received from the collection of the taxes imposed on the sale,
 storage, or use of sporting goods to be appropriated only to the
 Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission."