Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR283 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 283
 In Memory
 of
 M. James Moritz
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Austin and Port Arthur in mourning the loss of Dr. M.
 James Moritz, who died January 6, 2009, at the age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, Born January 1, 1923, in Port Arthur, James Moritz
 graduated from Thomas Jefferson High School and attended The
 University of Texas; his college years were interrupted during
 World War II when he was sent to Notre Dame University for officer
 training school as a member of the Naval Reserve; he served as the
 commanding officer of a sub-chaser in the Atlantic Theater and
 also served in the Pacific and the Philippines; on June 3, 1944,
 he married the love of his life, Dorothy "Dody" Sangalli; and
 WHEREAS, He graduated from The University of Texas Dental
 Branch in Houston in 1950 and began a general dentistry practice
 in Port Arthur; in 1964, he sold his practice, and after
 completing three more years of schooling in orthodontic
 dentistry, he moved to Austin in 1967 and practiced orthodontics;
 well-respected in his profession, he served for many years on the
 State Board of Dental Examiners; and
 WHEREAS, After closing his practice in orthodontics in
 1989, he assisted with the selling of dental practices across the
 nation and engaged in a number of local business ventures, which
 included organizing Capitol City Savings and serving as a partner
 in Balcones Associates; he also invested in the oil, gas, and
 gravel business and was active in real estate and land
 development; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Moritz was a well-known community leader who
 devoted much of his time and energy to numerous charitable
 causes; active with Caregivers of North Austin, he assisted
 thousands of elderly and ill Austin citizens over a five-year
 period; he was a devout Christian and a member of Redeemer
 Lutheran Church, where he served on the Board of Elders; and
 WHEREAS, In 1983, he founded the 100 Club of Central Texas,
 which now serves five Central Texas counties; the organization
 provides emotional and financial assistance to the families of
 law enforcement and public service workers who have lost their
 lives and to those who have been critically injured while serving
 in the line of duty; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Moritz devoted his life to helping others and
 was appropriately honored by the 100 Club with the Humanitarian
 Award of 2002; noted for his kindness and generous spirit, he was
 also a man who celebrated life to the fullest and was an avid
 golfer, fisherman, and sports enthusiast; and
 WHEREAS, An exemplary gentleman who was highly respected
 by the community, Dr. Moritz touched the lives of many and was
 beloved by his family and friends, and he leaves behind memories
 that will be deeply treasured by all who were privileged to share
 in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Dr. M. James Moritz: his wife, Dorothy; his sons and
 daughters-in-law, James Moritz, John Moritz and Hershey, and
 Allan Moritz and Tamara; his daughter, Jana Christian; and his
 grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Dr. M. James Moritz.
 Watson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 23, 2009,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate