Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR810 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 810
 In Memory
 of
 Frank Alvarado
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Houston in mourning the loss of Frank Alvarado, who
 died February 11, 2009, at the age of 79; and
 WHEREAS, Frank Alvarado was born October 4, 1929, in Marble
 Falls; he was an exemplary citizen, respected in the community
 for his many achievements; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Alvarado worked for more than 50 years in the
 construction trades as a union cement mason; he played a role in
 the construction of many of Houston's landmark structures,
 including Texas Children's Hospital, Saint Luke's Hospital, and
 the University of Houston; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Alvarado married Ida Melchor on June 12, 1947,
 and the couple raised five children in the East End community of
 Houston; and
 WHEREAS, A devout Catholic who practiced his faith in his
 daily life, Mr. Alvarado was an active participant at Saint
 Patrick's Catholic Church and Saint Alphonsus Catholic Church;
 he also gave his time and energy wholeheartedly to the activities
 of the Knights of Columbus, Council 4577; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, strength, and compassion, Mr.
 Alvarado gave unselfishly to others, and his wisdom, valued
 counsel, and strength of purpose will not be forgotten by those
 who knew him; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and
 grandfather, and his family and many friends will long cherish
 their treasured memories of his life and his many achievements;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 81st
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Frank Alvarado: his wife of 61 years, Ida Alvarado; his
 children, Frank Alvarado, Jr., and Yolanda, Robert, Elizabeth,
 and Carol Alvarado; and his six grandchildren and five
 great-grandchildren; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Frank Alvarado.
 Gallegos, Ellis, Hegar,
 Huffman, Jackson, Patrick,
 Whitmire, Williams
 ____________________________________________________________
 Member, Texas Senate Member, Texas Senate
 ____________________________________________________________
 Member, Texas Senate Member, Texas Senate
 ____________________________________________________________
 Member, Texas Senate Member, Texas Senate
 ____________________________________________________________
 Member, Texas Senate Member, Texas Senate
  ______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 1, 2009, by a
  rising vote.
  ______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate