LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2009 - 81st Regular
House
Committees
Rules & Resolutions
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Rules & Resolutions Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
House Rules & Resolutions Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR143
Congratulating Sarang Patel, salutatorian of the Dumas High School Class of 2013.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR42
Congratulating Eduardo A. Moreno, salutatorian of the Moises E. Molina High School Class of 2013.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR177
Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR181
Congratulating Andrew Loughran of Boy Scouts of America Troop No. 229 in Harker Heights on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR552
Recognizing March 8, 2017, as Missouri City Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR554
Commending CITGO Texas Operations for its more than 80 years of economic and community service contributions to the State of Texas.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular
Texas House Bill HR189
Recognizing February 19, 2013, as Panola County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR68
Congratulating the Lewisville High School softball team on winning the 2013 UIL 5A state championship.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular
Texas House Bill HR188
In memory of Ann Arnold of Austin, groundbreaking journalist, first female press secretary to a Texas governor, and longtime president of the Texas Association of Broadcasters.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular
Texas House Bill HR235
Recognizing February 13, 2013, as Dyslexia Awareness Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR134
Congratulating Nathan Dugie, valedictorian of the Ascension Academy Class of 2013.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR573
Congratulating Amanda Vodicka on her selection as a 2016 Corpus Christi Caller-Times/Citgo South Texas Distinguished Scholar.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR195
Recognizing February 28, 2015, as Rare Disease Day.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR580
Congratulating Jacqueline Elena Black on her selection as a 2016 Corpus Christi Caller-Times/Citgo South Texas Distinguished Scholar.
TX
Texas 2013 - 83rd 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR57
Congratulating Kiaria Sewell, salutatorian of the Poteet High School Class of 2013.
Page 117 of 667
117
118
119
120
121
122
123
124
125
126