LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2009 - 81st Regular
House
Committees
Rules & Resolutions
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Rules & Resolutions Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
House Rules & Resolutions Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR62
Commemorating the 12th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2018.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR93
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on March 31, 2018, the 23rd anniversary of her passing.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR63
Commemorating the 11th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2017.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR243
Commending Eric Faulkner for serving as Democratic Party precinct chair of Precinct 1295 in House District 95.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR271
Congratulating Amanda K. Edwards on being honored by Catholic Daughters of the Americas--Mother of Love Court No. 2092.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR94
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on March 31, 2017, the 22nd anniversary of her passing.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR276
In memory of John Kelso of Austin.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR66
Recognizing Diez y Seis de Septiembre 2018.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR73
Honoring the 2018 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR87
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2018, the 47th anniversary of her birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR84
Honoring the life of Benito Juarez on March 21, 2017, the 211th anniversary of his birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.
Texas House Bill HR255
Commending Gary Morgan for serving as Democratic Party precinct chair of Precinct 1146 in House District 95.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR75
Commemorating the 1969 Crystal City student walkout in 2018, the 49th anniversary of the event.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR68
Recognizing Diez y Seis de Septiembre 2017.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR92
Recognizing February 2-8, 2017, as Chicano History Week.
Page 12 of 667
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21