LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2009 - 81st Regular
House
Committees
Rules & Resolutions
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Rules & Resolutions Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
House Rules & Resolutions Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR27
Commemorating Easter 2015.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR369
Recognizing February 28, 2017, as North Houston Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR367
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of Robert B. Green Memorial Hospital in San Antonio.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR368
Recognizing February 27, 2017, as Southwest Region of National Black Law Students Association Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR26
Recognizing May 7, 2015, as National Day of Prayer in Texas.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR31
Commemorating Texas Independence Day 2015.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR43
Honoring President Ronald Reagan on the 105th anniversary of his birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR373
Commending members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation and recognizing the 2017 Texas Mission of Mercy.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR35
Commemorating Flag Day, June 14, 2015.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR33
Recognizing May 16, 2015, as Armed Forces Day.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR39
Commemorating National POW/MIA Recognition Day, September 18, 2015.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR40
Recognizing May 5, 2016, as National Day of Prayer in Texas.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR52
Recognizing May 5, 2015, as National Teacher Day in Texas.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR44
Commemorating Texas Independence Day 2016.
TX
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HR53
Recognizing May 3, 2016, as National Teacher Day in Texas.
Page 235 of 667
235
236
237
238
239
240
241
242
243
244