Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2009 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR604

Introduced
2/23/09  
Enrolled
2/26/09  
Recognizing February 25, 2009, as Texas Dental Association Day.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR605

Introduced
2/23/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
In memory of Veronica Teresa Cook of El Paso.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR606

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
5/18/09  
Welcoming Leadership Mid Valley to the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR607

Introduced
2/24/09  
Enrolled
2/26/09  
Recognizing February 25, 2009, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR608

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Honoring the Hamilton Park neighborhood in Dallas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR609

Introduced
2/24/09  
Enrolled
2/26/09  
Honoring Rites of Passage Program for Girls on the occasion of the organization's Women of Wisdom banquet on February 28, 2009.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR61

Introduced
1/5/09  
Enrolled
2/12/09  
In memory of Detective Thomas Luell Keen of the Harris County Sheriff's Office.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR610

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Recognizing March 3, 2009, as Ellis County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR611

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the founding of Texas PTA.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR612

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Welcoming members of Leadership Waxahachie to the State Capitol on March 3, 2009, and commending them for their contributions to Texas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR613

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/20/09  
Congratulating Bonnie Blum of Bellville ISD on being named Region 6 Education Service Center Teacher of the Year for 2008-2009 and on receiving the 2009 Suzan and Julius Glickman Teaching Award from the Texas Exes.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR614

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Commending James "Buddy" Reynolds for his service as Walker County commissioner.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR615

Introduced
2/24/09  
Enrolled
2/26/09  
Recognizing February 25, 2009, as Substance Abuse Prevention and Treatment Advocacy Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR616

Introduced
2/24/09  
Refer
2/25/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Recognizing March 5, 2009, as Grimes County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR617

Introduced
2/24/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Recognizing February 26, 2009, as Tarrant County Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records