Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate 2009 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR202

Introduced
2/11/09  
Enrolled
2/11/09  
Commemorating the Jack Yates High School Founder's Day celebration in Houston.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR203

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing February 19, 2009, as Austin County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR204

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
In memory of Royce Hopkins.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR205

Introduced
3/10/09  
Enrolled
3/10/09  
Commending the Boys and Girls Clubs of Texas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR206

Introduced
2/18/09  
Enrolled
2/18/09  
Congratulating the United States Coast Guard Reserve on the organization's 68th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR207

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing SafeHaven of Tarrant County on the occasion of its Legacy of Men Breakfast.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR208

Introduced
2/18/09  
Enrolled
2/18/09  
Recognizing February 18, 2009, as CASA Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR209

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing the Lambda Zeta chapter of Zeta Phi Beta Sorority, Incorporated, on the occasion of its 75th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR21

Introduced
1/28/09  
Enrolled
1/28/09  
Recognizing January 28, 2009, as Texas Capitol Schoolhouse Day.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR210

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing February 17, 2009, as Rockwall County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR211

Introduced
2/24/09  
Enrolled
2/24/09  
Recognizing February 24, 2009, as Rains County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR212

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing February 17, 2009, as Mansfield Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR213

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing the Mid-Valley Campus of South Texas College on the occasion of the college's 15th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR214

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing February 17, 2009, as Irving Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR215

Introduced
2/17/09  
Enrolled
2/17/09  
Recognizing February 17, 2009, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records