Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate 2009 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR664

Introduced
4/23/09  
Introduced
4/23/09  
Enrolled
4/23/09  
Enrolled
4/23/09  
Passed
4/23/09  
Congratulating the recipients of the 2009 Communities In Schools Best of Texas awards.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR665

Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Recognizing Spring Antioch Baptist Church in Spring on the occasion of its 10th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR666

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing the Federation of Bangladeshi Associations in North America on the occasion of their annual convention.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR667

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing Hooks-Epstein Galleries, Incorporated, on the occasion of its 40th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR668

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing Houston Community College on the occasion of the dedication of its Missouri City Campus.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR669

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Welcoming the members of the Odessa Hispanic Chamber of Commerce to the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR67

Introduced
1/28/09  
Enrolled
1/28/09  
Recognizing January 28, 2009, as Team Arlington Day.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR670

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing April 26 through May 2, 2009, as National Cleaning for a Reason Week.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR671

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing Fred Cochran on the occasion of his retirement from the Kaufman County Sheriff's Office.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR672

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Commending Donald L. Williams of El Paso for his contributions to his community.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR673

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing the Coppell Independent School District on the occasion of its 50th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR674

Introduced
4/22/09  
Introduced
4/22/09  
Enrolled
4/22/09  
Enrolled
4/22/09  
Passed
4/22/09  
Commending the Texas Retired Teachers Association and recognizing the week of March 29 through April 4, 2009, as Texas Retired Teachers Week.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR675

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing the Knights of Columbus West Texas Barbecue Association Championship Cookoff for being designated a Texas State Championship event.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR676

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Passed
4/21/09  
Recognizing April 26, 2009, as Texas Music Awards Day in Texas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR677

Introduced
4/21/09  
Introduced
4/21/09  
Enrolled
4/21/09  
Recognizing May 13, 2009, as Texas Environmental Excellence Awards Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records