Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1075 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anderson of Dallas, Truitt, et al. H.B. No. 1075
 (Senate Sponsor - Davis)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 17, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an alert for a missing person with an intellectual
 disability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter L, Chapter 411,
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER L. STATEWIDE AMERICA'S MISSING: BROADCAST EMERGENCY
 RESPONSE (AMBER) ALERT SYSTEM FOR ABDUCTED CHILDREN AND MISSING
 PERSONS WITH INTELLECTUAL DISABILITIES
 SECTION 2.  Section 411.351, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivisions (2) and (3) and adding Subdivisions (2-a) and
 (3-a) to read as follows:
 (2)  "Alert system" means the statewide America's
 Missing: Broadcast Emergency Response (AMBER) alert system for
 abducted children and missing persons with intellectual
 disabilities.
 (2-a) "Intellectual disability" means significantly
 subaverage general intellectual functioning that is concurrent
 with deficits in adaptive behavior and originates during the
 developmental period.  The term includes a pervasive developmental
 disorder.
 (3)  "Local law enforcement agency" means a local law
 enforcement agency with jurisdiction over the investigation of:
 (A)  the abduction of a child; or
 (B)  a missing person with an intellectual
 disability.
 (3-a)  "Pervasive developmental disorder" means a
 disorder that meets the criteria for a pervasive developmental
 disorder established in the most recent Diagnostic and Statistical
 Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric
 Association.
 SECTION 3.  Section 411.352, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.352.  STATEWIDE AMERICA'S MISSING: BROADCAST
 EMERGENCY RESPONSE (AMBER) ALERT SYSTEM FOR ABDUCTED CHILDREN AND
 MISSING PERSONS WITH INTELLECTUAL DISABILITIES. With the
 cooperation of the Texas Department of Transportation, the office
 of the governor, and other appropriate law enforcement agencies in
 this state, the department shall develop and implement a statewide
 alert system to be activated on behalf of an abducted child or a
 missing person with an intellectual disability.
 SECTION 4.  Section 411.355, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.355.  ACTIVATION. (a) On the request of a local
 law enforcement agency regarding an abducted child, the department
 shall activate the alert system and notify appropriate participants
 in the alert system, as established by rule, if:
 (1)  the local law enforcement agency believes that a
 child has been abducted, including a child who:
 (A)  is younger than 14 years of age; and
 (B)  regardless of whether the child departed
 willingly with the other person, has been taken from the care and
 custody of the child's parent or legal guardian without the
 permission of the parent or legal guardian by another person who is:
 (i)  more than three years older than the
 child; and
 (ii)  not related to the child by any degree
 of consanguinity or affinity as defined under Subchapter B, Chapter
 573, Government Code;
 (2)  the local law enforcement agency believes that the
 abducted child is in immediate danger of serious bodily injury or
 death or of becoming the victim of a sexual assault;
 (3)  the local law enforcement agency confirms that a
 preliminary investigation has taken place that verifies the
 abduction and eliminates alternative explanations for the child's
 disappearance; and
 (4)  sufficient information is available to
 disseminate to the public that could assist in locating the child, a
 person suspected of abducting the child, or a vehicle suspected of
 being used in the abduction.
 (b)  On the request of a local law enforcement agency
 regarding a missing person with an intellectual disability, the
 department shall activate the alert system and notify appropriate
 participants in the alert system, as established by rule, if:
 (1)  the local law enforcement agency receives notice
 of a missing person with an intellectual disability;
 (2)  the local law enforcement agency verifies that at
 the time the person is reported missing:
 (A)  the person has an intellectual disability, as
 determined according to the procedure provided by Section 593.005,
 Health and Safety Code; and
 (B)  the person's location is unknown;
 (3)  the local law enforcement agency determines that
 the person's disappearance poses a credible threat to the person's
 health and safety; and
 (4)  sufficient information is available to
 disseminate to the public that could assist in locating the person.
 (c)  The department may modify the criteria described by
 Subsection (a) or (b) as necessary for the proper implementation of
 the alert system.
 SECTION 5.  Section 411.356, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.356.  LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES. Before
 requesting activation of the alert system, a local law enforcement
 agency must verify that the criteria described by Section
 411.355(a) or (b), as applicable, have been satisfied. On
 verification of the applicable criteria, the local law enforcement
 agency shall immediately contact the department to request
 activation and shall supply the necessary information on the forms
 prescribed by the director.
 SECTION 6.  Section 411.358, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.358.  TERMINATION. The director shall terminate
 any activation of the alert system with respect to a particular
 abducted child or a particular missing person with an intellectual
 disability if:
 (1)  the abducted child or missing person is recovered
 or the situation [abduction] is otherwise resolved; or
 (2)  the director determines that the alert system is
 no longer an effective tool for locating and recovering the
 abducted child or missing person.
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter L, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.359 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.359.  SYSTEM NAME.  The director by rule may assign
 a name other than America's Missing: Broadcast Emergency Response
 (AMBER) to the alert system when the system is activated regarding a
 missing person with an intellectual disability.
 SECTION 8.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the public
 safety director of the Department of Public Safety of the State of
 Texas shall adopt rules and issue directives necessary to implement
 Subchapter L, Chapter 411, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *