Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1111 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hartnett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 1111
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 19, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1111 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a tenant's failure to pay rent during an appeal of an
 eviction for nonpayment of rent after filing a pauper's affidavit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.004, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.004.  JURISDICTION. A justice court in the precinct
 in which the real property is located has jurisdiction in eviction
 suits. Eviction suits include forcible entry and detainer and
 forcible detainer suits. A justice court has jurisdiction to issue
 a writ of possession under Sections 24.0054(a), (a-2), and (a-3).
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.0053, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If a tenant files a pauper's affidavit in the period
 prescribed by Section 24.0052 to appeal an eviction for nonpayment
 of rent, the justice court shall provide to the tenant a written
 notice at the time the pauper's affidavit is filed that contains the
 following information in bold or conspicuous type:
 (1)  the amount of the initial deposit of rent stated in
 the judgment that the tenant must pay into the justice court
 registry;
 (2)  whether the initial deposit must be paid in cash,
 cashier's check, or money order, and to whom the cashier's check or
 money order, if applicable, must be made payable;
 (3)  the calendar date by which the initial deposit
 must be paid into the justice court registry;
 (4)  for a court that closes before 5 p.m. on the date
 specified by Subdivision (3), the time the court closes; and
 (5)  a statement that failure to pay the required
 amount into the justice court registry by the date prescribed by
 Subdivision (3) may result in the court issuing a writ of possession
 without hearing.
 (a-2)  The date by which an initial deposit must be paid into
 the justice court registry under Subsection (a-1)(3) must be within
 five days of the date the tenant files the pauper's affidavit as
 required by Rule 749b(1), Texas Rules of Civil Procedure.
 SECTION 3.  Section 24.0054, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsections (a-1),
 (a-2), (a-3), and (a-4) to read as follows:
 (a)  During an appeal of an eviction case for nonpayment of
 rent, the justice court on request shall immediately issue a writ of
 possession, without hearing, if:
 (1)  a tenant fails to pay the initial rent deposit into
 the justice court registry within five days of the date the tenant
 filed a pauper's affidavit as required by Rule 749b(1), Texas Rules
 of Civil Procedure, and Section 24.0053;
 (2)  the justice court has provided the written notice
 required by Section 24.0053(a-1); and
 (3)  the justice court has not yet forwarded the
 transcript and original papers to the county court as provided by
 Subsection (a-2).
 (a-1)  The sheriff or constable shall execute a writ of
 possession under Subsection (a) in accordance with Sections
 24.0061(d) through (h). The landlord shall bear the costs of
 issuing and executing the writ of possession.
 (a-2)  The justice court shall forward the transcript and
 original papers in an appeal of an eviction case to the county court
 but may not forward the transcript and original papers before the
 sixth day after the date the tenant files a pauper's affidavit,
 except that, if the court confirms that the tenant has timely paid
 the initial deposit of rent into the justice court registry in
 accordance with Section 24.0053, the court may forward the
 transcript and original papers immediately. If the tenant has not
 timely paid the initial deposit into the justice court registry,
 the justice court on request shall issue a writ of possession
 notwithstanding the fact that the tenant has perfected an appeal by
 filing a pauper's affidavit that has been approved by the court. The
 justice court shall forward the transcript and original papers in
 the case to the county court for trial de novo, notwithstanding the
 fact that a writ of possession under this section has already been
 issued.
 (a-3)  Notwithstanding Subsections (a) and (a-2), the
 justice court may not issue a writ of possession if the tenant has
 timely deposited the tenant's portion of the rent claimed by the
 tenant under Section 24.0053(d).
 (a-4)  During an appeal of an eviction case for nonpayment of
 rent, if a tenant fails to pay rent into the justice court or county
 court registry as the rent becomes due under the rental agreement in
 accordance with the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure and Section
 24.0053, the landlord may file with the county court a sworn motion
 that the tenant failed to pay rent as required. The landlord shall
 notify the tenant of the motion and the hearing date.
 (e)  In a motion or hearing [in county court] under
 Subsection (a-4), or in a motion to dismiss an appeal of an eviction
 case in county court [(a)], the parties may represent themselves or
 be represented by their authorized agents, who need not be
 attorneys.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an eviction suit filed on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A suit filed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2012.
 * * * * *