Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1136 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 1136
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1136 By:  Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring an election authority to provide notice to
 certain county chairs regarding certain election activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.124 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.124.  PROVISION OF NOTICE TO COUNTY CHAIRS BY
 ELECTION AUTHORITY. (a)  A county election officer of each county
 shall hold a meeting with the county chair of each political party
 to discuss, as appropriate, the following for each primary election
 or general election for state and county officers:
 (1)  the lists provided by each political party under
 Section 85.009;
 (2)  the lists provided by each political party under
 Section 87.002(c); and
 (3)  the implementation of Subchapters A, B, C, and D,
 Chapter 87.
 (b)  A county election officer of each county shall deliver
 written notice of the time and place of the meeting required by
 Subsection (a) not later than 72 hours before the meeting date to
 the county chair of each political party that made nominations by
 primary election for the general election for state and county
 officers preceding the date of the meeting.
 (c)  The notice required by Subsection (b) may be delivered
 by United States mail, electronic mail, or other method of written
 communication, as determined by the county election officer.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *