Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1158 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 29, 2011      TO: Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1158 by Eissler (Relating to additional optional training and course work for public school principals.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1158, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,609,274) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 29, 2011





  TO: Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1158 by Eissler (Relating to additional optional training and course work for public school principals.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1158 by Eissler (Relating to additional optional training and course work for public school principals.), As Introduced

 Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education 

 Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1158 by Eissler (Relating to additional optional training and course work for public school principals.), As Introduced

HB1158 by Eissler (Relating to additional optional training and course work for public school principals.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1158, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,609,274) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1158, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,609,274) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($1,541,524)   2013 ($67,750)   2014 ($67,750)   2015 ($67,750)   2016 ($67,750)    


2012 ($1,541,524)
2013 ($67,750)
2014 ($67,750)
2015 ($67,750)
2016 ($67,750)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 ($1,541,524) 5.8   2013 ($67,750) 1.0   2014 ($67,750) 1.0   2015 ($67,750) 1.0   2016 ($67,750) 1.0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 ($1,541,524) 5.8   2013 ($67,750) 1.0   2014 ($67,750) 1.0   2015 ($67,750) 1.0   2016 ($67,750) 1.0  


2012 ($1,541,524) 5.8
2013 ($67,750) 1.0
2014 ($67,750) 1.0
2015 ($67,750) 1.0
2016 ($67,750) 1.0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would create a school turnaround specialist endorsement to the principal certificate. The bill would require the State Board of Educator Certification (SBEC) to establish the training requirements and course work to ensure that persons who participate meet the provisions of the new requirements.  The bill would require the SBEC to adopted rules by January 1, 2012 and solicit proposals from the educator preparation programs (EPPS) by March 1, 2012.  The new program would be required to have a qualified faculty, establish an admissions process, provide for a full-time internship for one semester, and collaborate with school districts to provide a minimum two-year support to the principal assigned to a low performing campus.   The SBEC would periodically evaluate program data that is submitted annually and every five years for evaluation.

The bill would create a school turnaround specialist endorsement to the principal certificate. The bill would require the State Board of Educator Certification (SBEC) to establish the training requirements and course work to ensure that persons who participate meet the provisions of the new requirements. 

The bill would require the SBEC to adopted rules by January 1, 2012 and solicit proposals from the educator preparation programs (EPPS) by March 1, 2012.  The new program would be required to have a qualified faculty, establish an admissions process, provide for a full-time internship for one semester, and collaborate with school districts to provide a minimum two-year support to the principal assigned to a low performing campus.  

The SBEC would periodically evaluate program data that is submitted annually and every five years for evaluation.

Methodology

The Texas Education Agency (TEA) estimates that provisions of the bill related to the software development of the new program would require $686,000 for professional services and operational costs and $29,774 for software licenses in fiscal year 2012, including 4.75 contract full-time equivalents (FTEs) in fiscal year 2012 only.   It is estimated that 1.0 FTE at the TEA would be required to develop the training requirements and course work and provide ongoing technical support at a cost of $75,750 in fiscal year 2012 and $67,750 in each subsequent fiscal year, inclusive of salary, benefits, and other operating expenses.  TEA estimates the bill would require $750,000 to develop the program assessment in FY 2012 to ensure candidates are qualified to participate in the new program.

The Texas Education Agency (TEA) estimates that provisions of the bill related to the software development of the new program would require $686,000 for professional services and operational costs and $29,774 for software licenses in fiscal year 2012, including 4.75 contract full-time equivalents (FTEs) in fiscal year 2012 only.  

It is estimated that 1.0 FTE at the TEA would be required to develop the training requirements and course work and provide ongoing technical support at a cost of $75,750 in fiscal year 2012 and $67,750 in each subsequent fiscal year, inclusive of salary, benefits, and other operating expenses. 

TEA estimates the bill would require $750,000 to develop the program assessment in FY 2012 to ensure candidates are qualified to participate in the new program.

Technology

Technology costs for software development are estimated at $556,000 for professional services for FY 2012. An additional $29,774 would be required for software licenses in FY 2012.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 701 Central Education Agency

701 Central Education Agency

LBB Staff: JOB, LXH, JGM, JW

 JOB, LXH, JGM, JW