Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1274 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pena, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 1274
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 20, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the payment of a toll for unmarked
 military vehicles conducting or training for emergency operations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 362.901(d), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  In this section:
 (1)  "Military vehicle" includes an unmarked military
 vehicle operated by military personnel conducting an emergency
 preparedness, response, or recovery operation or participating in a
 training exercise for an emergency preparedness, response, or
 recovery operation. The term does not include a vehicle operated
 for personal use.
 (2)  "Toll [, "toll] project" includes a toll road,
 toll highway, turnpike, toll bridge, ferry, or similar project,
 users of which are required to pay a toll or fare.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *