Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1286 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1286


 AN ACT
 relating to adoption of rules by the University Interscholastic
 League.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.0831 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.0831.  UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE RULES:
 FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT. (a) The legislative council of the
 University Interscholastic League may not take final action on a
 new or amended rule that would result in additional costs for a
 member school unless a fiscal impact statement regarding the rule
 has been completed in accordance with this section.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), final action by the
 legislative council means:
 (1)  submitting a rule to school superintendents, if
 the submission is required under the legislative council's
 procedures; or
 (2)  submitting a rule approved by the council to the
 commissioner for the commissioner's approval under Section
 33.083(b), if the rule does not require submission to school
 superintendents under the legislative council's procedures.
 (c)  A fiscal impact statement regarding a rule must include:
 (1)  a projection of the costs to member schools of
 complying with the rule during the five-year period following the
 effective date of the rule; and
 (2)  an explanation of the methodology used to analyze
 the fiscal impact of the rule and determine the costs projection
 required by Subdivision (1).
 (d)  If a fiscal impact statement is prepared for a rule, a
 copy of the statement must be attached to the rule when it is
 submitted for approval to school superintendents, if applicable,
 and when it is submitted to the commissioner for approval.
 SECTION 2.  Section 33.0831, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a rule on which the legislative council of
 the University Interscholastic League takes final action on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1286 was passed by the House on March
 30, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1286 on May 19, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1286 on May 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 116,
 Nays 30, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1286 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 13, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1286 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1
 .
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor