Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1293 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1293
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Moore County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1064.104(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, as effective April 1, 2011, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The hospital system may include:
 (1)  facilities for domiciliary care and treatment of
 the sick or injured;
 (2)  facilities for outpatient clinics;
 (3)  dispensaries;
 (4)  facilities for geriatric [domiciliary] care,
 including assisted living facilities and independent elderly
 living facilities;
 (5)  nursing [convalescent] home facilities;
 (6)  necessary nurses' domiciliaries and training
 centers;
 (7)  blood banks;
 (8)  community mental health centers;
 (9)  research centers or laboratories; and
 (10)  any other facilities the board considers
 necessary for hospital care.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1064.110(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A construction or purchase contract that involves the
 expenditure of more than the amount provided by Section 271.024,
 Local Government Code, [$15,000] may be made only after advertising
 in the manner provided by Subchapter B, Chapter 271, Local
 Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *