Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1347 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 11, 2011      TO: Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1347 by Hughes (Relating to a refund of registration fees paid by home builders to the Texas Residential Construction Commission.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1347, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($600,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 11, 2011





  TO: Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1347 by Hughes (Relating to a refund of registration fees paid by home builders to the Texas Residential Construction Commission.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1347 by Hughes (Relating to a refund of registration fees paid by home builders to the Texas Residential Construction Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 Honorable Joe Deshotel, Chair, House Committee on Business & Industry 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1347 by Hughes (Relating to a refund of registration fees paid by home builders to the Texas Residential Construction Commission.), As Introduced

HB1347 by Hughes (Relating to a refund of registration fees paid by home builders to the Texas Residential Construction Commission.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1347, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($600,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1347, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($600,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($300,000)   2013 ($300,000)   2014 ($300,000)   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 ($300,000)
2013 ($300,000)
2014 ($300,000)
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 ($300,000)   2013 ($300,000)   2014 ($300,000)   2015 $0   2016 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 ($300,000)   2013 ($300,000)   2014 ($300,000)   2015 $0   2016 $0  


2012 ($300,000)
2013 ($300,000)
2014 ($300,000)
2015 $0
2016 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Comptroller to refund a prorated amount of a fee that was paid by a builder to the Texas Residential Construction Commission (TRCC) for an original or renewed certificate of registration that did not expire before September 1, 2009. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011. 

Methodology

TRCC was abolished in 2009 and ceased operations on August 31,2010.  In the agency's last months the fee for home builder original or renewal certificates of registration was pro-rated for the period TRCC would remain in operation.  However some certificates of registration were not pro-rated due to the ability of home builders to send in renewals or applications in advance.  Refunds required by the bill's provisions would be $300,000 annually through fiscal 2014, at which time refunds would cease. This analysis assumes that any duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.

TRCC was abolished in 2009 and ceased operations on August 31,2010.  In the agency's last months the fee for home builder original or renewal certificates of registration was pro-rated for the period TRCC would remain in operation.  However some certificates of registration were not pro-rated due to the ability of home builders to send in renewals or applications in advance.  Refunds required by the bill's provisions would be $300,000 annually through fiscal 2014, at which time refunds would cease.

This analysis assumes that any duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: JOB, AG, SD

 JOB, AG, SD