Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1423 House Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS             H.B. 1423     By: Garza     Government Efficiency & Reform     Committee Report (Unamended)             BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    Observers note that Texas teachers are burdened with a large volume of paperwork, not all of which is directly related to preparing lesson plans or grading tests and homework assignments or to other activities relating to a teacher's classroom duties. Interested parties suggest that a reduction in the amount of required paperwork would give a teacher more time to spend on matters directly affecting the teacher's delivery of classroom instruction. The parties note that legislation could address these concerns by requiring each school district board of trustees to adopt policies that result in a significant reduction in the amount of written information a teacher must prepare and by requiring a study on how a school district can achieve the specified reduction goals. H.B. 1423 seeks to address these issues.       RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.       ANALYSIS    H.B. 1423 amends the Education Code to add a temporary provision, set to expire September 1, 2015, to require the board of trustees of each school district to adopt policies that result in a reduction of at least 50 percent in the total amount of written information that a teacher is required to prepare, as determined in comparison to the total amount of written information required to be prepared by a teacher during the 2011-2012 school year, and to require a district to implement these required policies beginning not later than the 2014-2015 school year.   H.B. 1423 adds a temporary provision, set to expire January 31, 2013, to require the commissioner of education to conduct a study of how a school district can timely accomplish the results concerning reduction in the written information a teacher is required to prepare and to require the commissioner, not later than January 1, 2013, to submit the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officers of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over public education and to make the results available to each school district in Texas.       EFFECTIVE DATE    On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2011.        

BILL ANALYSIS

# BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

 

H.B. 1423
By: Garza
Government Efficiency & Reform
Committee Report (Unamended)

H.B. 1423

By: Garza

Government Efficiency & Reform

Committee Report (Unamended)

 

 

 

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    Observers note that Texas teachers are burdened with a large volume of paperwork, not all of which is directly related to preparing lesson plans or grading tests and homework assignments or to other activities relating to a teacher's classroom duties. Interested parties suggest that a reduction in the amount of required paperwork would give a teacher more time to spend on matters directly affecting the teacher's delivery of classroom instruction. The parties note that legislation could address these concerns by requiring each school district board of trustees to adopt policies that result in a significant reduction in the amount of written information a teacher must prepare and by requiring a study on how a school district can achieve the specified reduction goals. H.B. 1423 seeks to address these issues.
RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.
ANALYSIS    H.B. 1423 amends the Education Code to add a temporary provision, set to expire September 1, 2015, to require the board of trustees of each school district to adopt policies that result in a reduction of at least 50 percent in the total amount of written information that a teacher is required to prepare, as determined in comparison to the total amount of written information required to be prepared by a teacher during the 2011-2012 school year, and to require a district to implement these required policies beginning not later than the 2014-2015 school year.   H.B. 1423 adds a temporary provision, set to expire January 31, 2013, to require the commissioner of education to conduct a study of how a school district can timely accomplish the results concerning reduction in the written information a teacher is required to prepare and to require the commissioner, not later than January 1, 2013, to submit the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officers of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over public education and to make the results available to each school district in Texas.
EFFECTIVE DATE    On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2011.

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE 

 

Observers note that Texas teachers are burdened with a large volume of paperwork, not all of which is directly related to preparing lesson plans or grading tests and homework assignments or to other activities relating to a teacher's classroom duties. Interested parties suggest that a reduction in the amount of required paperwork would give a teacher more time to spend on matters directly affecting the teacher's delivery of classroom instruction. The parties note that legislation could address these concerns by requiring each school district board of trustees to adopt policies that result in a significant reduction in the amount of written information a teacher must prepare and by requiring a study on how a school district can achieve the specified reduction goals. H.B. 1423 seeks to address these issues.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY 

 

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.

 

ANALYSIS 

 

H.B. 1423 amends the Education Code to add a temporary provision, set to expire September 1, 2015, to require the board of trustees of each school district to adopt policies that result in a reduction of at least 50 percent in the total amount of written information that a teacher is required to prepare, as determined in comparison to the total amount of written information required to be prepared by a teacher during the 2011-2012 school year, and to require a district to implement these required policies beginning not later than the 2014-2015 school year.

 

H.B. 1423 adds a temporary provision, set to expire January 31, 2013, to require the commissioner of education to conduct a study of how a school district can timely accomplish the results concerning reduction in the written information a teacher is required to prepare and to require the commissioner, not later than January 1, 2013, to submit the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officers of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over public education and to make the results available to each school district in Texas.

 

EFFECTIVE DATE 

 

On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2011.